E
|
05/13/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
05/13/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
E
|
05/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1491
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2788
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1455
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2575
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1436
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1436
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1436
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1435
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1446
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1317
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1971
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#480
|
Journal Page: 1971
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1971
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1970
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#422
|
Journal Page: 1847
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1847
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1847
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2374
|
Journal Page: 1847
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1283
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 706
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 328
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 310
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|