House | 05/06/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3344 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3344 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2194 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1347 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1347 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1347 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1346 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1346 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1262 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Amendment fails of adoption | Journal Page: 1262 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA4 Menndez | Journal Page: 1260 |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Amendment(s) offered FA4 Menéndez | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Menéndez | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Menéndez | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1257 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1257 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1182 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1039 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1003 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 397 | |
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 381 | |
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3344 | |
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3344 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |