Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1044 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/11/2023 9:00 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 25 2023 5:13PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Referred to Elections: Apr 28 2023 2:39PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23