E
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
E
|
05/23/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4980
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4983
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2250
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2188
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4684
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1868
|
Journal Page: 4684
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Record vote RV#1868
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4684
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Amended
|
3-J.E. Johnson
|
Journal Page: 4684
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-J.E. Johnson
|
Journal Page: 4683
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Amendment withdrawn 2-J.E. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 4683
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4646
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4584
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Amended
|
2-Murr
|
Journal Page: 4584
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4584
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Postponed
|
5/18/23 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4245
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4245
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4220
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4646
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 706
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 695
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 695
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 694
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 694
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 694
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 683
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 658
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 313
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|