E
|
05/10/2023
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
05/10/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1751
|
E
|
05/01/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2575
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1423
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1401
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1371
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2054
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#503
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1975
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1975
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 2639
|
Journal Page: 1975
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2048
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1706
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1706
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Nichols
|
Journal Page: 979
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 979
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 979
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 957
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 883
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Reported from s/c with no recommendation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Considered by subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1706
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 314
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|