Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1089 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 14, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 11, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2023
Bill March 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 21, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 6, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note March 15, 2023