Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 04/11/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 04/06/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Referred to Elections: Apr 12 2023 12:21PM
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 17 2023 1:42PM
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 17 2023 1:42PM
Last Action: 04/18/2023 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 21 2023 10:27AM