E | 06/18/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 06/18/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3309 | |
E | 05/29/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3307 | |
House | 05/26/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5890 | |
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2966 | |
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2543 | |
Senate | 05/23/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2501 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5081 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Record vote | RV#2008 | Journal Page: 5080 |
House | 05/23/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 5080 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 5080 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4954 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4954 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4564 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2188 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2188 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2047 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1232 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1232 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1232 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1231 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1231 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1231 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1231 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1042 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 344 | |
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |