E | 05/24/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/24/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2684 | |
E | 05/15/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1929 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4313 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1859 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1845 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4191 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#1667 | Journal Page: 4191 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4191 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4191 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4026 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1569 | Journal Page: 4025 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4025 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) | Journal Page: 4025 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4025 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3477 | Journal Page: 4025 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3713 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 1833 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1833 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1729 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1060 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1060 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1060 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 1060 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Bettencourt | Journal Page: 1059 |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1059 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1059 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1080 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 766 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1833 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 347 | |
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |