Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB114 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/28/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Menéndez, Eckhardt, Zaffirini S.B. No. 114
 (In the Senate - Filed November 14, 2022; February 15, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 28, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 28, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 114 By:  Menéndez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of electricity service in the ERCOT power
 region.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.101(b), Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A customer is entitled:
 (1)  to be informed about rights and opportunities in
 the transition to a competitive electric industry;
 (2)  to choose the customer's retail electric provider
 consistent with this chapter, to have that choice honored, and to
 assume that the customer's chosen provider will not be changed
 without the customer's informed consent;
 (3)  to have access to providers of energy efficiency
 services, to on-site distributed generation, and to providers of
 energy generated by renewable energy resources;
 (4)  to be served by a provider of last resort that
 offers a commission-approved standard service package;
 (5)  to receive sufficient information to make an
 informed choice of service provider;
 (6)  to be protected from unfair, misleading, or
 deceptive practices, including protection from being billed for
 services that were not authorized or provided; [and]
 (7)  to have an impartial and prompt resolution of
 disputes with its chosen retail electric provider and transmission
 and distribution utility;
 (8)  to participation in demand response programs
 through retail electric providers that offer demand response
 programs; and
 (9)  to receive notice from the retail electric
 provider that serves the customer when the independent organization
 certified under Section 39.151 for the ERCOT power region issues an
 emergency energy alert.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.919 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.919.  AVERAGE TOTAL RESIDENTIAL LOAD REDUCTION
 GOALS. (a)  The commission by rule shall establish goals in the
 ERCOT power region to reduce the average total residential load.
 (b)  The rules adopted under Subsection (a) must provide for
 the adoption of a program that:
 (1)  provides demand response participation to
 residential customers where reasonably available;
 (2)  promotes the use of smart metering technology;
 (3)  is capable of responding to an emergency energy
 alert about low operating reserves issued by the independent
 organization certified under Section 39.151 for the ERCOT power
 region;
 (4)  provides opportunities for demand response
 providers to contract with retail electric providers to provide
 demand response services;
 (5)  ensures the program does not impact the critical
 needs of vulnerable populations;
 (6)  facilitates the widespread deployment of smart
 responsive appliances and devices in a manner that enables the
 customer's appliance or device to be enrolled as part of a demand
 response product or plan offered by a retail electric provider;
 (7)  establishes the method by which the components of
 the ratio described by Subsection (c) are calculated for purposes
 of determining whether the goals described by Subsection (a) have
 been achieved;
 (8)  provides for achievement of demand reductions
 within both summer and winter seasons; and
 (9)  allows a retail electric provider that offers a
 demand response program under this section to obtain funding for
 the demand response program through an energy efficiency incentive
 program established under Section 39.905.
 (c)  The goals described by Subsection (a) must be calculated
 as a ratio by dividing the amount of load reduced at peak demand by
 the total amount of demand, at the same time, of all residential
 customers who have responsive appliances or devices at their
 premises that reduce the electric consumption of the customers.
 SECTION 3.  The Public Utility Commission of Texas shall
 adopt rules as necessary for the adoption of a program to begin
 facilitating the widespread deployment of appliances and devices
 capable of being part of a demand response product or plan offered
 by a retail electric provider, as provided by Section 39.919(b)(6),
 Utilities Code, as added by this Act, before December 31, 2024.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *