Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB114 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 11, 2023
Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 28, 2023
Analysis April 28, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis April 28, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill April 28, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note April 12, 2023