Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1144 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 11, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 24, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note March 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 11, 2023