Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1145 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 25, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 8, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 24, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 6, 2023
Bill May 16, 2023
Bill May 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis March 25, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 22, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023