Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1167 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 20, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 4, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 2, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023