E | 05/19/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/19/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2243 | |
E | 05/08/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1657 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3466 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1635 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1597 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1550 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2800 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Record vote | RV#912 | Journal Page: 2799 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2799 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2799 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2777 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2777 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2663 | Journal Page: 2777 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2792 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1924 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1924 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1839 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1112 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1112 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1112 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1112 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1112 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1112 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1112 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1924 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 351 | |
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |