House
|
05/22/2023
|
Postponed
|
3/23/24 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4961
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
Journal Page: 4961
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4961
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4834
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 811
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 811
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 811
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 810
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 810
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 810
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 810
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 810
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 810
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 810
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 638
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 351
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|