Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1181 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 7, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 17, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023