House | 05/23/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4387 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2462 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2462 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1836 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1099 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1099 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1099 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1099 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1099 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1099 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1099 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1039 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 805 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2462 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2462 | |
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |