House | 05/23/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4609 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1924 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1924 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1633 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 989 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 989 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 989 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 989 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Paxton | Journal Page: 988 |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1003 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 852 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1924 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 355 | |
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |