Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1205 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/27/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            2023S0189-1 02/22/23
 By: Paxton S.B. No. 1205


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the modernization of information technology of state
 agencies and certain local governments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 325, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 325.0124 to read as follows:
 Sec. 325.0124.  REVIEW OF AGENCY'S IMPLEMENTATION OF
 INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY MODERNIZATION PLAN. As part of its review
 of a state agency, the commission shall consider and make
 recommendations regarding the extent to which the agency has
 updated, upgraded, or procured technology based on the agency's
 information technology modernization plan included in the agency's
 strategic plan required by Section 2056.002.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2054.003, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivisions (11) and (11-a) to read as follows:
 (11)  "Peer-to-peer payment" means a transfer of funds
 using a peer-to-peer payment system.
 (11-a)  "Peer-to-peer payment system" means a digital
 non-credit card system used for transferring funds from one party
 to another.
 SECTION 3.  Section 2054.060, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Unless expressly prohibited by other law or a rule
 adopted by the state agency, a state agency shall accept a digital
 signature included in any communication or payment electronically
 delivered to the state agency.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter C, Chapter 2054, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2054.0692 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2054.0692.  GUIDANCE ON USE OF DISTRIBUTED LEDGER
 TECHNOLOGY. (a) The department shall develop and disseminate
 guidance for the use of distributed ledger technology, including
 blockchain, among state agencies.
 (b)  The guidance must include a framework or model for
 deciding if distributed ledger technology is appropriate for
 meeting a state agency's needs. The guidance may include:
 (1)  examples of potential uses of distributed ledger
 technology by an agency;
 (2)  sample procurement and contractual language; and
 (3)  information on educational resources for agencies
 on distributed ledger technology.
 SECTION 5.  Section 2054.095(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Except as otherwise modified by the Legislative Budget
 Board or the governor, instructions under Subsection (a) must
 require each state agency's strategic plan to include:
 (1)  a description of the agency's information
 resources management organizations, policies, and practices,
 including the extent to which the agency uses its project
 management practices, as defined by Section 2054.152;
 (2)  a description of how the agency's information
 resources programs support and promote its mission, goals, and
 objectives and the goals and policies of the state strategic plan
 for information resources;
 (3)  a description of customer service technology,
 including telephone systems and websites, that improves customer
 service performance; and
 (4)  other planning components that the department may
 prescribe.
 SECTION 6.  Section 2054.1115, Government Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  A state agency or local government that uses the state
 electronic Internet portal may use electronic payment methods,
 including the acceptance of peer-to-peer payments, credit cards,
 and debit cards, for:
 (1)  point-of-sale transactions, including:
 (A)  person-to-person transactions;
 (B)  transactions that use an automated process to
 facilitate a person-to-person transaction; and
 (C)  transactions completed by a person at an
 unattended self-standing computer station using an automated
 process;
 (2)  telephone transactions; or
 (3)  mail transactions.
 (c)  The department shall identify the three most commonly
 used peer-to-peer payment systems and post a list containing those
 systems in a conspicuous location on the department's Internet
 website. The department shall biennially review and, if necessary,
 update the list required under this subsection.
 SECTION 7.  Subchapter L, Chapter 2054, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2054.393 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2054.393.  MARKETING OF SERVICES. (a) Notwithstanding
 Section 2113.011 and subject to Subsection (b), the department may
 use appropriated money to market to state agencies and local
 governments shared information resources technology services
 offered by the department under this subchapter, including data
 center, disaster recovery, and cybersecurity services.
 (b)  An expenditure of money under this section must be
 approved by the executive director.
 SECTION 8.  Subchapter R, Chapter 2054, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2054.603 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2054.603.  INTERNET WEBSITE DOMAIN REQUIREMENTS. (a)
 This section does not apply to a university system or institution of
 higher education as defined by Section 61.003, Education Code.
 (b)  Unless granted an exemption by the department, a state
 agency or local government shall use the top-level domain ".gov" or
 ".texas.gov" for the entity's official Internet website.
 (c)  The department shall assist state agencies and local
 governments in obtaining a ".gov" or ".texas.gov" domain for the
 entity's official Internet website. Using money appropriated to
 the department for this purpose, the department may establish a
 grant program to assist state agencies' and local governments'
 transition to the ".gov" or ".texas.gov" domain. If the department
 establishes a grant program, the department must enter into a
 contract that includes performance requirements with each grant
 recipient. The department shall monitor and enforce the terms of
 each contract.
 SECTION 9.  Chapter 2056, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 2056.0023 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2056.0023.  INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY MODERNIZATION PLAN.
 (a) As part of the strategic plan required under Section 2056.002,
 a state agency shall include an information technology
 modernization plan that outlines the manner in which the agency
 intends to transition its information technology and data-related
 services and capabilities into a more modern, integrated, secure,
 and effective technological environment.
 (b)  The Department of Information Resources may provide a
 template for the information technology modernization plan
 required by this section.
 SECTION 10.  The Department of Information Resources shall
 develop and disseminate the guidance and decision model required by
 Section 2054.0692, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later
 than December 1, 2023.
 SECTION 11.  (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
 this section, each state agency and local government shall comply
 with the requirements of Section 2054.603(b), Government Code, as
 added by this Act, as soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act but not later than September 1, 2028.
 (b)  A state agency or local government shall comply with the
 requirements of Section 2054.603(b), Government Code, as added by
 this Act, as soon as practicable after the effective date of this
 Act but not later than September 1, 2024, if the state agency or
 local government uses its official Internet website to:
 (1)  collect or maintain information pertaining to the
 identity or finances of a person; or
 (2)  provide election results, services, or
 information.
 SECTION 12.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.