Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1217 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 15, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 21, 2023
Analysis May 21, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2023
Bill May 8, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 1, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023
Analysis April 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note May 15, 2023
Fiscal Note April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note April 18, 2023