Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1243 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 20, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 6, 2023
Analysis May 5, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 30, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 13, 2023
Bill May 10, 2023
Bill May 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 13, 2023
Analysis May 5, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 21, 2023