E | 06/18/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/18/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3310 | |
E | 05/25/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2989 | |
House | 05/25/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5615 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2712 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2429 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 4991 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2347 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 2347 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Read | Journal Page: 2347 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2346 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 2070 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4572 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Record vote | RV#1815 | Journal Page: 4572 |
House | 05/18/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4572 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4572 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | Journal Page: 4420 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Amended | 1-Bonnen | Journal Page: 4419 |
House | 05/17/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 4419 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Postponed | 5/17/23 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 4256 |
House | 05/15/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4256 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2195 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 1495 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1495 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1392 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 888 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 888 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 888 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 888 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 888 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 888 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 888 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1495 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 358 | |
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |