Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1250 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

                    S.B. No. 1250


 AN ACT
 relating to the powers of the Harris County Water Control and
 Improvement District No. 110; providing authority to impose a fee
 and impose fines and penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle F, Title 6, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by adding Chapter 7938 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 7938. HARRIS COUNTY WATER CONTROL AND IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT
 NO. 110
 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 7938.0101.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "district"
 means the Harris County Water Control and Improvement District
 No. 110.
 SUBCHAPTER B. POWERS AND DUTIES
 Sec. 7938.0201.  AUTHORITY TO ISSUE CERTIFICATES OF
 COMPLIANCE FOR STORMWATER DETENTION FACILITIES. (a) The district
 may implement a program to require and issue an annual written
 certificate of compliance to the owner or operator of a stormwater
 detention facility within the boundaries of the district to ensure
 that each stormwater detention facility is operating to abate
 flooding as designed and approved by the applicable regulatory
 authority.
 (b)  The district may assess reasonable charges and fees for
 the implementation, administration, and enforcement of this
 section.
 (c)  The district may impose a fine or penalty on the owner or
 operator of a stormwater detention facility for the failure to hold
 a certificate of compliance as required by the district under this
 section.
 (d)  This section does not apply to a stormwater detention
 facility that is owned or operated by a public entity other than the
 district or that operates under a permit held by a public entity
 other than the district.
 SECTION 2.  The Harris County Water Control and Improvement
 District No. 110 retains all the rights, powers, privileges,
 authority, duties, and functions that it had before the effective
 date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  The legislature validates and confirms all
 governmental acts and proceedings of the Harris County Water
 Control and Improvement District No. 110 that were taken before the
 effective date of this Act.
 (b)  This section does not apply to any matter that on the
 effective date of this Act:
 (1)  is involved in litigation if the litigation
 ultimately results in the matter being held invalid by a final court
 judgment; or
 (2)  has been held invalid by a final court judgment.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1250 passed the Senate on
 April 12, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 17, 2023, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1250 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 12, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 116,
 Nays 24, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor