Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1250 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 17, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 8, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 29, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 6, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note March 17, 2023