Senate | 05/16/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1985 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1923 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 507 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 362 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 362 | |
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |