Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB130 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 10, 2023
Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 27, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill March 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 22, 2023
Fiscal Note March 13, 2023