E | 05/29/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/29/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3308 | |
E | 05/17/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2066 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4550 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2010 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1988 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1952 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4332 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Record vote | RV#1723 | Journal Page: 4332 |
House | 05/16/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4332 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4332 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4254 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4254 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 982 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 982 | |
House | 03/27/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 912 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 618 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 588 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 588 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 588 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 588 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 587 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 587 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 587 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 543 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 364 | |
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |