E | 05/13/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/13/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1929 | |
E | 05/02/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1491 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2788 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1455 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1448 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1444 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2380 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2374 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Record vote | RV#681 | Journal Page: 2380 |
House | 04/28/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2380 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2380 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2360 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2360 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2819 | Journal Page: 2360 |
House | 04/25/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2049 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1495 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1495 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1392 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 889 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 889 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 889 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 889 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 889 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 889 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 889 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 685 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1495 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 364 | |
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |