Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1318 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 3, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Analysis May 20, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill March 29, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 27, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 24, 2023
Fiscal Note March 6, 2023