E | 05/24/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/24/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2684 | |
E | 05/12/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1859 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4216 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1833 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1817 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1765 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1487 | Journal Page: 3866 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3798 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#1455 | Journal Page: 3797 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3797 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3797 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3480 | Journal Page: 3797 |
House | 05/05/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3211 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 1301 | |
House | 04/10/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1301 | |
House | 03/16/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 730 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 424 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 420 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 420 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 420 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Huffman | Journal Page: 419 |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 419 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 419 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 423 | |
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 381 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 368 | |
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1301 | |
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 295 | |
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |