E | 05/19/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/19/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2243 | |
E | 05/08/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1657 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3466 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1635 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1607 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2928 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Record vote | RV#999 | Journal Page: 2927 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2927 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2927 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2872 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Point of order sustained (amendment) | Rule 11, Section 2 | Journal Page: 2872 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Slaton | Journal Page: 2872 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2872 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3051 | Journal Page: 2872 |
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2342 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 1495 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1495 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 889 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 889 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 889 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 889 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 889 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 889 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 889 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 766 | |
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 706 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1495 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 433 | |
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |