Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1348 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 04/27/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Miles S.B. No. 1348
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2023; March 16, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture & Rural
 Affairs; April 27, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 2; April 27, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of state money for the Urban Farm
 Microenterprise Support Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 44A.002(b), Agriculture Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *