Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1388 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 7, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 26, 2023
Analysis April 26, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 26, 2023