Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1392 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 88R11017 MP-F
22 By: Middleton S.B. No. 1392
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to establishing the oyster council of the Parks and
88 Wildlife Department.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. Chapter 76, Parks and Wildlife Code, is amended
1111 by adding Subchapter D to read as follows:
1212 SUBCHAPTER D. OYSTER COUNCIL
1313 Sec. 76.201. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "council"
1414 means the oyster council established under this subchapter.
1515 Sec. 76.202. ESTABLISHMENT AND PURPOSE. (a) The oyster
1616 council is established to advise the commission, director, and
1717 department on the taking of oysters in this state.
1818 (b) Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the
1919 council.
2020 Sec. 76.203. COMPOSITION. The council is composed of 13
2121 members appointed by the commission, each of whom must:
2222 (1) hold a commercial oyster fisherman's license; or
2323 (2) be nominated by the holder of a commercial oyster
2424 fisherman's license.
2525 Sec. 76.204. TERMS; VACANCY. (a) Council members serve
2626 staggered six-year terms, with the terms of four or five members
2727 expiring on January 1 of each even-numbered year.
2828 (b) A vacancy on the council shall be filled in the same
2929 manner as the original appointment.
3030 Sec. 76.205. REMOVAL FROM COUNCIL. The commission may
3131 remove a council member if the member has been absent from three or
3232 more council meetings scheduled within the preceding 12 months,
3333 unless the absences are excused. The commission shall post notice
3434 of the removal on the commission's Internet website.
3535 Sec. 76.206. OFFICERS. The council shall elect from the
3636 council's membership a presiding officer and assistant presiding
3737 officer.
3838 Sec. 76.207. MEETINGS. (a) The council on its own
3939 initiative may meet at any time to discuss any council business,
4040 including restrictions on the taking of oysters.
4141 (b) The council shall:
4242 (1) notify the commission not later than the 11th day
4343 before the date of a council meeting; and
4444 (2) not later than the seventh day before the date of a
4545 council meeting, post notice of the meeting on the department's
4646 Internet website.
4747 (c) Except for a closed meeting authorized by Subchapter D,
4848 Chapter 551, Government Code, a council meeting is open to the
4949 public.
5050 (d) Notice of a council meeting must be given as provided by
5151 Chapter 551, Government Code.
5252 (e) A council meeting shall be held at a location determined
5353 by the council.
5454 (f) The council shall:
5555 (1) broadcast live on the department's Internet
5656 website all council meetings, other than closed meetings; and
5757 (2) maintain on the department's Internet website an
5858 archive of council meetings.
5959 (g) A recording of a council meeting must be maintained in
6060 the archive required under Subsection (f) through and including the
6161 second anniversary of the meeting.
6262 Sec. 76.208. OPEN MEETINGS AND OPEN RECORDS. Except as
6363 specifically provided by this chapter or another law, the council
6464 is subject to Chapters 551 and 552, Government Code.
6565 Sec. 76.209. RESTRICTIONS ON TAKING OF OYSTERS. (a) The
6666 council must meet if the commission, director, or department
6767 requests a meeting to discuss imposing a restriction described by
6868 Section 76.305.
6969 (b) The council members may make recommendations regarding
7070 a restriction on the taking of oysters requested under Subsection
7171 (a).
7272 Sec. 76.210. RECOMMENDATIONS FOR OYSTER MANAGEMENT;
7373 REPORT. (a) The council shall advise the commission and department
7474 and make recommendations concerning the administrative aspects of
7575 the taking of oysters.
7676 (b) Annually, on or before a date established by the
7777 department before the opening of oyster season, the council shall
7878 submit to the commission and department a report evaluating the
7979 taking of oysters in this state.
8080 Sec. 76.211. ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURES; RULES. (a) The
8181 director shall establish administrative procedures to carry out the
8282 requirements of this subchapter.
8383 (b) The commission shall adopt any rules necessary for the
8484 administration of the council established under this subchapter.
8585 SECTION 2. Subchapter E, Chapter 76, Parks and Wildlife
8686 Code, is amended by adding Section 76.305 to read as follows:
8787 Sec. 76.305. RESTRICTIONS ON TAKING OF OYSTERS.
8888 Notwithstanding any other provision of this code, the commission,
8989 director, and department shall consult with the oyster council in
9090 accordance with Section 76.209 before:
9191 (1) closing an area to the taking of oysters;
9292 (2) closing an open season for the taking of oysters on
9393 a date earlier than the department's previously published closing
9494 date for the season; or
9595 (3) during an open season for the taking of oysters,
9696 adopting or amending commission rules or department guidelines
9797 regarding the taking of oysters, including:
9898 (A) size limits;
9999 (B) bag limits; and
100100 (C) limits on the time of day during which the
101101 taking of oysters is authorized.
102102 SECTION 3. Sections 76.118(c) and (g), Parks and Wildlife
103103 Code, are amended to read as follows:
104104 (c) A person who violates Sections 76.109 and [either
105105 Section 76.115 or] 76.116 in the same criminal episode commits an
106106 offense that is a Class A Parks and Wildlife Code misdemeanor.
107107 (g) If it is shown on the trial of a defendant for a
108108 violation of Sections [Section] 76.109 and [either Section 76.115
109109 or] 76.116 occurring in the same criminal episode that the
110110 defendant has been convicted once before within five years before
111111 the trial date of a violation of Sections [Section] 76.109 and
112112 [either Section 76.115 or] 76.116 occurring in the same criminal
113113 episode, the defendant is guilty of a Parks and Wildlife Code
114114 felony.
115115 SECTION 4. Section 76.115, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
116116 repealed.
117117 SECTION 5. (a) Not later than December 1, 2023, the Parks
118118 and Wildlife Commission shall adopt rules and procedures necessary
119119 to administer the oyster council established under Subchapter D,
120120 Chapter 76, Parks and Wildlife Code, as added by this Act.
121121 (b) As soon as practicable after the adoption of rules and
122122 procedures under Subsection (a) of this section but not later than
123123 January 1, 2024, the Parks and Wildlife Commission shall appoint
124124 the initial members of the oyster council established under
125125 Subchapter D, Chapter 76, Parks and Wildlife Code, as added by this
126126 Act.
127127 (c) At the first meeting of the oyster council that follows
128128 the appointment of the initial council members, the council members
129129 shall draw lots to determine which four council members will serve
130130 terms that expire on January 1, 2026, which four council members
131131 will serve terms that expire on January 1, 2028, and which five
132132 council members will serve terms that expire on January 1, 2030.
133133 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
134134 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
135135 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
136136 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
137137 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.