House | 04/25/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2042 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2042 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1839 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1189 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1189 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1189 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1189 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1126 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1126 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 1126 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Paxton | Journal Page: 1125 |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1125 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1039 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 767 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 704 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2042 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 439 | |
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |