Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1399 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 3, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 16, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 15, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 15, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 19, 2023
Fiscal Note April 4, 2023