E
|
06/02/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/02/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
E
|
05/19/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4827
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2130
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4608
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2057
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2057
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2057
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1905
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1688
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4227
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1686
|
Journal Page: 4214
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4214
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote RV#1685
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
19-Goodwin
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 19-Goodwin
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote RV#1684
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 18-J. González
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote RV#1683
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 17-Bucy
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote RV#1682
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 16-Reynolds
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote RV#1681
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 15-Garcia
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote RV#1680
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 14-Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote RV#1679
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 13-Zwiener
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote RV#1678
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 12-Anchía
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote RV#1677
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 11-Talarico
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote RV#1676
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 10-Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote RV#1675
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 9-Flores
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote RV#1674
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 8-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote RV#1673
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 7-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote RV#1672
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 6-Martinez Fischer
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote RV#1671
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 5-Wu
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote RV#1670
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 4-Hinojosa
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote RV#1669
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amended
|
2-Oliverson
|
Journal Page: 4194
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amended 2-Oliverson
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 1-M. González
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1)
|
Journal Page: 4193
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4193
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Corrected comm. report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3714
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3163
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1)
|
Journal Page: 3163
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 12; Article III, Section 16
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3162
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2914
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2733
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1)
|
Journal Page: 2733
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2733
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2049
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1444
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1444
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1046
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2057
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 770
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 749
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 749
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 724
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 724
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 723
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA4 Campbell
|
Journal Page: 723
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Campbell
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 723
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Vote reconsidered
|
FA1 Campbell
|
Journal Page: 723
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Vote reconsidered FA1 Campbell
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 722
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 722
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-M. Gonzlez
|
Journal Page: 4193
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 678
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 678
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Menndez
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 675
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 675
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Campbell
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 675
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 674
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 682
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 635
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 615
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 582
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1444
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 341
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|