E
|
05/24/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
05/24/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2684
|
E
|
05/12/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1859
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4048
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1789
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1789
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1789
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1789
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1139
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2982
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Amended
|
1-A. Johnson
|
Journal Page: 2982
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Amended 1-A. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2982
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Postponed
|
5/4/23 12:15 PM
|
Journal Page: 2928
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Postponed
|
5/4/23 9:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2853
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2853
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2668
|
Journal Page: 2853
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2914
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1729
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1083
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1049
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1049
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1049
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1049
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1049
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1049
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1049
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Zaffirini
|
Journal Page: 1048
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1048
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1048
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1080
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 929
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 439
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|