E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5974
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3090
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3090
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3090
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3087
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2012
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4399
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1756
|
Journal Page: 4398
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4398
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4397
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4362
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4362
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 1301
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1301
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1009
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 724
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 724
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 724
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 724
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 724
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 724
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 724
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1301
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 441
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|