Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3001
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3001
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5626
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5626
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5618
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5618
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5618
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2902
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2902
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2902
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2902
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2892
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5033
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1979
|
Journal Page: 5033
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5033
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Amended
|
1-E. Morales
|
Journal Page: 5024
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5024
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4878
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1940
|
Journal Page: 4878
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4878
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amended
|
1-J. Lopez
|
Journal Page: 4877
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4877
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Postponed
|
5/22/23 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4600
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4600
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2792
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1393
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 929
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 706
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|