House | 05/04/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 3062 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3062 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3068 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1543 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1310 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3062 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 441 | |
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |