E
|
06/02/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/02/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
E
|
05/19/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4827
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2130
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4608
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2047
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2047
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2047
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2041
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1876
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4100
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1580
|
Journal Page: 4100
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4100
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4100
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4080
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4080
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3468
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1393
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 929
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 769
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 441
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|