Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1421 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 24, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 28, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill March 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 27, 2023
Fiscal Note March 24, 2023