House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4628
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Withdrawn from calendar (contested)
|
|
Journal Page: 4628
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4220
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3899
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3713
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2463
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2463
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2337
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1401
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1364
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1364
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1364
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1364
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1364
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1364
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1364
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1238
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2463
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 444
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|