Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1467 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 7, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 11, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 18, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 22, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 22, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note May 5, 2023
Fiscal Note April 18, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023