E | 05/19/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/19/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2243 | |
E | 05/08/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1657 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3466 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1635 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1607 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2926 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Record vote | RV#997 | Journal Page: 2926 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2926 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2926 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2855 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2855 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3199 | Journal Page: 2855 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 1924 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1924 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1836 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1005 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1924 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 446 | |
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |