Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1499 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 19, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 1, 2023
Analysis May 1, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 22, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 21, 2023
Bill May 16, 2023
Bill May 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 21, 2023
Analysis May 1, 2023
Analysis March 19, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 1, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023