Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1506 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 1506
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to a seizure management and treatment plan for the care to
66 be provided by a public school to a student with a seizure disorder.
77 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
88 SECTION 1. Sections 38.032(a) and (b), Education Code, are
99 amended to read as follows:
1010 (a) The parent or guardian of a student with a seizure
1111 disorder may seek care for the student's seizures while the student
1212 is at school or participating in a school activity by submitting to
1313 the school district at which the student is enrolled a copy of a
1414 seizure management and treatment plan developed by the student's
1515 parent or guardian and the physician responsible for the student's
1616 seizure treatment. The plan must be:
1717 (1) on the form adopted under Subsection (b); and
1818 (2) submitted to and reviewed by the district:
1919 (A) [(1)] before or at the beginning of the
2020 school year;
2121 (B) [(2)] on enrollment of the student, if the
2222 student enrolls in the district after the beginning of the school
2323 year; or
2424 (C) [(3)] as soon as practicable following a
2525 diagnosis of a seizure disorder for the student.
2626 (b) The agency shall adopt and post on the agency's Internet
2727 website a form to be used in submitting a [A] seizure management and
2828 treatment plan under this section. The form must request the
2929 following information:
3030 (1) the student's name and date of birth;
3131 (2) the names and contact information of the student's
3232 parent or guardian, the physician responsible for the student's
3333 seizure treatment, and at least one other emergency contact;
3434 (3) any medical history significant to the student's
3535 seizure disorder;
3636 (4) the type, length, and frequency of the student's
3737 seizures;
3838 (5) a description of each type of seizure the student
3939 has experienced;
4040 (6) the student's seizure triggers or warning signs;
4141 (7) the student's ability to manage seizures and the
4242 student's level of understanding of the seizures;
4343 (8) the student's response after a seizure;
4444 (9) the basic first aid to be provided to the student
4545 during a seizure, including whether the student needs to leave the
4646 classroom after a seizure and the process for the student's return
4747 to the classroom, if applicable;
4848 (10) a description of what constitutes a seizure
4949 emergency for the student;
5050 (11) a description of seizure emergency protocol for
5151 district personnel to follow in the event of a seizure emergency for
5252 the student;
5353 (12) a treatment protocol for any medications or other
5454 procedures to be administered by district personnel to the student
5555 during school hours, including:
5656 (A) each daily or emergency medication,
5757 including:
5858 (i) the name and dosage of the medication
5959 and the time at which the medication is to be given;
6060 (ii) common side effects for the
6161 medication; and
6262 (iii) any special instructions regarding
6363 the medication; and
6464 (B) whether the student has a vagus nerve
6565 stimulator and, if so, appropriate magnet use for the stimulator;
6666 (13) any special considerations or precautions
6767 applicable to the student; and
6868 (14) the signatures of [identify the health care
6969 services the student may receive at school or while participating
7070 in a school activity;
7171 [(2) evaluate the student's ability to manage and level
7272 of understanding of the student's seizures; and
7373 [(3) be signed by] the student's parent or guardian and
7474 the physician responsible for the student's seizure treatment.
7575 SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2023, the Texas
7676 Education Agency shall adopt and post on the agency's Internet
7777 website the form required under Section 38.032(b), Education Code,
7878 as amended by this Act.
7979 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only
8080 to a seizure management and treatment plan submitted to a school
8181 district on or after January 1, 2024.
8282 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
8383 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
8484 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
8585 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
8686 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
8787 ______________________________ ______________________________
8888 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
8989 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1506 passed the Senate on
9090 May 3, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
9191 ______________________________
9292 Secretary of the Senate
9393 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1506 passed the House on
9494 May 12, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 131, Nays 9, two
9595 present not voting.
9696 ______________________________
9797 Chief Clerk of the House
9898 Approved:
9999 ______________________________
100100 Date
101101 ______________________________
102102 Governor