E
|
05/19/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/19/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
E
|
05/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3466
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1635
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3072
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1579
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1579
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1579
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1444
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#747
|
Journal Page: 2474
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2474
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amended
|
1-C.J. Harris
|
Journal Page: 2474
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2474
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2374
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#681
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 3493
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1393
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 930
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 890
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 890
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 890
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 890
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 890
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 890
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 890
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 767
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 705
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 450
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|